Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00972 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 12, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 9, 2021