Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00983 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 27, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 28, 2021