House
|
06/14/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Public Act 21-43
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
File Number 779
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 9691
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 9648
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 9489
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 9664
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9520
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9659
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
House Calendar Number 538
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8860
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
File Number 404
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 248
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|