LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB01003
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01003
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2021 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01003
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note
May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note
April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note
April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note
April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note
April 8, 2021
Bill
March 3, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
July 23, 2021
Analysis
April 29, 2021
Analysis
April 8, 2021
Bill
April 8, 2021
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
May 25, 2021
Compare