Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01008 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 5, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 9, 2021