Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2021
|
Public Act 21-108
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House Calendar Number 567
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8380
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
File Number 295
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 201
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|