Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01011 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 28, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 7, 2021
Analysis May 28, 2021
Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 18, 2021