Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01016 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/14/2021

                     
Researcher: JP 	Page 1 	4/14/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 1016  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING MUNICIPAL ETHICS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires each municipality to adopt and maintain a code of 
ethics by October 1, 2022. A municipality is deemed in compliance if 
it:  
 adopts an ethics code before January 1, 2022, or  
 adopts by October 1, 2022, and after that maintains, provisions 
of the model ethics code that the Office of State Ethics (OSE) 
must establish.  
The bill requires OSE, in consultation with the Connecticut 
Conference of Municipalities and Connecticut Council of Small Towns, 
to (1) develop a model municipal ethics code that municipalities may 
adopt and (2) publish this code on its website by January 1, 2022. OSE 
must update the model code as it deems necessary.   
Under the bill, each municipality must submit a notice to OSE by 
January 15, 2023, certifying whether it has complied with the bill’s 
requirements and providing a copy of its code.  It requires OSE to 
submit a report to the Government Administration and 
Elections Committee on the status of each municipality’s compliance 
by January 1, 2024.   
The bill also authorizes OSE, within available appropriations, to 
conduct a municipal ethics education program for municipal officials 
or employees, or organizations made up of municipal members.   
EFFECTIVE DATE: January 1, 2022, except the code 
adoption requirement is effective October 1, 2022.   2021SB-01016-R000456-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JP 	Page 2 	4/14/21 
 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Government Administration and Elections Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 14 Nay 4 (03/29/2021)