Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01016 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/14/2021

                             
 
LCO 4020  \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01016-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 2 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1016  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 4020 
 
 
Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT 
ADMINISTRATION AND ELECTIONS 
 
 
Introduced by:  
(GAE)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING MUNICIPAL ETHICS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2021) (a) Notwithstanding the 1 
provisions of any special act, municipal charter or ordinance, not later 2 
than October 1, 2022, each municipality shall adopt and maintain a code 3 
of ethics. Any municipality that has adopted a code of ethics prior to 4 
January 1, 2022, shall not be required to adopt a new code of ethics 5 
under this section. Any municipality that adopts provisions of the 6 
model municipal code of ethics, developed by the Office of State Ethics 7 
under subsection (b) of this section, on or before October 1, 2022, and 8 
thereafter maintains such provisions, shall be deemed in compliance 9 
with the requirements of this section. 10 
(b) Not later than January 1, 2022, the Office of State Ethics, in 11 
consultation with the Connecticut Conference of Municipalities and 12 
Connecticut Council of Small Towns, shall develop and publish on its 13 
Internet web site a model municipal code of ethics which may be 14 
adopted by municipalities. The office shall update such model 15  Raised Bill No. 1016 
 
 
LCO 4020  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01016-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
municipal code of ethics as the office deems necessary. 16 
(c) Not later than January 15, 2023, each municipality shall submit a 17 
notice to the Office of State Ethics certifying whether the municipality 18 
has complied with the requirements of this section. Such notice shall 19 
include a copy of such municipality's code of ethics. 20 
Sec. 2. (Effective January 1, 2022) Not later than January 1, 2024, the 21 
Office of State Ethics shall submit a report, in accordance with the 22 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing 23 
committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 24 
relating to ethics. Such report shall indicate the status of the compliance 25 
of each municipality with the requirements of section 1 of this act. 26 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective January 1, 2022) The Office of State Ethics may, 27 
within available appropriations, conduct a municipal ethics education 28 
program for municipal officials or employees or for organizations made 29 
up of municipal members. 30 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 2 January 1, 2022 New section 
Sec. 3 January 1, 2022 New section 
 
GAE Joint Favorable