Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01016 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO 4020 \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01016-R01-
4-SB.docx
5-1 of 2
3+
4+LCO No. 4020 1 of 2
65
76 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1016
87 January Session, 2021
98 LCO No. 4020
109
1110
12-Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT
13-ADMINISTRATION AND ELECTIONS
11+Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT ADMINISTRATION
12+AND ELECTIONS
1413
1514
1615 Introduced by:
1716 (GAE)
17+
1818
1919
2020
2121 AN ACT CONCERNING MU NICIPAL ETHICS.
2222 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2323 Assembly convened:
2424
2525 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2021) (a) Notwithstanding the 1
2626 provisions of any special act, municipal charter or ordinance, not later 2
2727 than October 1, 2022, each municipality shall adopt and maintain a code 3
2828 of ethics. Any municipality that has adopted a code of ethics prior to 4
2929 January 1, 2022, shall not be required to adopt a new code of ethics 5
3030 under this section. Any municipality that adopts provisions of the 6
3131 model municipal code of ethics, developed by the Office of State Ethics 7
3232 under subsection (b) of this section, on or before October 1, 2022, and 8
3333 thereafter maintains such provisions, shall be deemed in compliance 9
3434 with the requirements of this section. 10
3535 (b) Not later than January 1, 2022, the Office of State Ethics, in 11
3636 consultation with the Connecticut Conference of Municipalities and 12
3737 Connecticut Council of Small Towns, shall develop and publish on its 13
3838 Internet web site a model municipal code of ethics which may be 14
3939 adopted by municipalities. The office shall update such model 15 Raised Bill No. 1016
4040
4141
42-LCO 4020 {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01016-
43-R01-SB.docx }
44-2 of 2
42+
43+LCO No. 4020 2 of 2
4544
4645 municipal code of ethics as the office deems necessary. 16
4746 (c) Not later than January 15, 2023, each municipality shall submit a 17
4847 notice to the Office of State Ethics certifying whether the municipality 18
4948 has complied with the requirements of this section. Such notice shall 19
5049 include a copy of such municipality's code of ethics. 20
5150 Sec. 2. (Effective January 1, 2022) Not later than January 1, 2024, the 21
5251 Office of State Ethics shall submit a report, in accordance with the 22
5352 provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing 23
5453 committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 24
5554 relating to ethics. Such report shall indicate the status of the compliance 25
5655 of each municipality with the requirements of section 1 of this act. 26
5756 Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective January 1, 2022) The Office of State Ethics may, 27
5857 within available appropriations, conduct a municipal ethics education 28
5958 program for municipal officials or employees or for organizations made 29
6059 up of municipal members. 30
6160 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
6261 sections:
6362
6463 Section 1 October 1, 2021 New section
6564 Sec. 2 January 1, 2022 New section
6665 Sec. 3 January 1, 2022 New section
6766
68-GAE Joint Favorable
67+Statement of Purpose:
68+To require every municipality to adopt a code of ethics and the Office of
69+State Ethics to develop a model municipal code of ethics for
70+municipalities to adopt.
71+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
72+that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
73+underlined.]
6974