Senate | 07/12/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Special Act 21-24 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | House Calendar Number 361 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | File Number 252 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 176 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |