Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01021 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/24/2021

                             
 
 
Substitute Senate Bill No. 1021 
 
Special Act No. 21-24 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY 
WORKING GROUP. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) As used in this section: (1) 
"Industry 4.0 technology" means the hardware, software and related 
innovations associated with the digitization of the manufacturing 
sector, allowing for the collection and analysis of all aspects of the 
manufacturing operations leading to increased quality, efficiency, 
productivity and security; and (2) "small and mid-sized manufacturers" 
means businesses engaged in manufacturing having fewer than one 
hundred fifty employees at any individual facility owned or operated 
by the business. 
(b) The chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce shall 
appoint and convene a manufacturing technology working group to 
develop a strategic plan to ensure that manufacturers in the state have a 
strategy for the lean application and integration of Industry 4.0 
technology into their product development and production processes. 
(c) The working group shall: 
(1) Compile comprehensive profiles, including mission statements  Substitute Senate Bill No. 1021 
 
Special Act No. 21-24 	2 of 3 
 
and lists of services, for all entities that receive state or federal funding 
for the purpose of researching, developing, training, marketing, 
consulting or deploying Industry 4.0 technology or associated services 
directly to, or for the benefit of, manufacturing startups, small and mid-
sized manufacturers or other businesses primarily engaged in 
manufacturing; and 
(2) Conduct value-stream mapping and other analyses, as needed, to 
assess the flow of services from the entities identified in subdivision (1) 
of this subsection, to manufacturers in the state. Such analyses shall 
include, but need not be limited to, (A) identification of the extent to 
which such services complement, conflict with or duplicate each other, 
(B) assessment of the relative impacts of such services on the 
manufacturers served, (C) identification of gaps in services provided 
relative to the Industry 4.0 technology needs of manufacturers, (D) 
identification of barriers and recommendations for achieving the goals 
of the working group described in subsection (b) of this section, and (E) 
identification and assessment of participation levels in small business 
innovation research programs and small business technology transfer 
programs. 
(d) The chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce shall 
appoint members to the working group. Appointments to the working 
group shall include, but need not be limited to, representatives from the 
joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 
matters relating to commerce, the Governor's chief manufacturing 
officer, representatives of entities described in subdivision (1) of 
subsection (c) of this section, a representative of the Connecticut Center 
for Advanced Technology, a representative of CONNSTEP, 
representatives of at least two manufacturers having fewer than 
seventy-five employees, representatives of at least two manufacturers 
having not less than seventy-five employees and not more than one  Substitute Senate Bill No. 1021 
 
Special Act No. 21-24 	3 of 3 
 
hundred fifty employees, a representative of CTNext, a representative 
of the Connecticut Manufacturers' Collaborative, a representative of the 
Connecticut State Colleges and Universities, a representative of the 
Connecticut Conference of Independent Colleges, a representative of 
The University of Connecticut and a representative of Central 
Connecticut State University. The members of the working group 
representing small and mid-sized manufacturers shall comprise not less 
than thirty-three per cent of the working group and manufacturers shall 
comprise not less than fifty per cent of the working group. 
(e) The members appointed to represent the Connecticut Center for 
Advanced Technology and CONNSTEP shall cochair the work ing 
group. The cochairs shall schedule the first meeting of the working 
group not later than August 31, 2021. 
(f) Not later than March 15, 2022, the working group shall submit a 
report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general 
statutes, on its progress in accomplishing the goals set forth in 
subsection (b) of this section to the joint standing committee of the 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce. 
Such report shall identify any barriers to accomplishing the goals set 
forth in subsection (b) of this section. 
(g) Not later than October 1, 2022, the working group shall submit a 
strategic plan, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the 
general statutes, to the joint standing committee of the General 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce that 
includes data, findings and legislative proposals to accomplish the goals 
set forth in subsection (b) of this section. The working group shall 
terminate on the date it submits such report or October 1, 2022, 
whichever is later.