Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01021 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/03/2021

                        
 
 
 
LCO No. 4355  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1021  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 4355 
 
 
Referred to Committee on COMMERCE  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(CE)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A MANUFACTURING TECH NOLOGY 
WORKING GROUP. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) As used in this section: (1) 1 
"Industry 4.0 technology", means the hardware, software and related 2 
innovations associated with the digitization of the manufacturing 3 
sector, allowing for the collection and analysis of all aspects of the 4 
manufacturing operations leading to increased quality, efficiency, 5 
productivity and security; and (2) "small and mid-sized manufacturers" 6 
means businesses engaged in manufacturing having fewer than one 7 
hundred fifty employees at any individual facility owned or operated 8 
by the business. 9 
(b) The chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General 10 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce shall 11 
appoint and convene a manufacturing technology working group to 12 
develop a strategic plan to ensure that manufacturers in the state have a 13 
clear road map for the lean application and integration of Industry 4.0 14 
technology into their product development and production processes. 15  Raised Bill No.  1021 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4355   	2 of 4 
 
(c) The working group shall: 16 
(1) Compile comprehensive profiles, including mission statements 17 
and lists of services, for all entities that receive state funding for the 18 
purpose of researching, developing, training, marketing, consulting or 19 
deploying Industry 4.0 technology or associated services directly to, or 20 
for the benefit of, manufacturing startups, small and mid-sized 21 
manufacturers or other businesses primarily engaged in manufacturing; 22 
and 23 
(2) Conduct value-stream mapping and other analyses, as needed, to 24 
assess the flow of services from the entities identified in subdivision (1) 25 
of this subsection, to manufacturers in the state. Such analyses shall 26 
include, but need not be limited to, (A) identifying the extent to which 27 
such services complement, conflict with or duplicate each other, (B) 28 
assessing the relative impacts of such services on the manufacturers 29 
served, (C) identifying gaps in services provided relative to the Industry 30 
4.0 technology needs of manufacturers, and (D) identifying barriers and 31 
recommendations for achieving the goals of the working group 32 
described in subsection (b) of this section. 33 
(d) The chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General 34 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce shall 35 
appoint members to the working group. Appointments to the working 36 
group shall include, but need not be limited to, representatives from the 37 
joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 38 
matters relating to commerce, the chief manufacturing officers or 39 
representatives of entities described in subdivision (1) of subsection (c) 40 
of this section, a representative of the Connecticut Center for Advanced 41 
Technology, a representative of CONNSTEP, representatives of at least 42 
two manufacturers having fewer than seventy -five employees, 43 
representatives of at least two manufacturers having not less than 44 
seventy-five employees and not more than one hundred fifty 45 
employees, a representative of CTNext, a representative of the 46 
Connecticut Manufacturers' Collaborative, a representative of the 47 
Connecticut State Colleges and Universities, a representative of the 48  Raised Bill No.  1021 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4355   	3 of 4 
 
Connecticut Conference of Independent Colleges, a representative of 49 
The University of Connecticut and a representative of Central 50 
Connecticut State University. The members of the working group 51 
representing small and mid-sized manufacturers shall comprise not less 52 
than thirty-three per cent of the working group and manufacturers shall 53 
comprise not less than fifty per cent of the working group. 54 
(e) The members appointed to represent the Connecticut Center for 55 
Advanced Technology and CONNSTEP shall co -chair the working 56 
group. The co-chairs shall schedule the first meeting of the working 57 
group not later than August 31, 2021. 58 
(f) (1) The working group may solicit state or federal funds, or 59 
funding from nongovernmental foundations, private organizations, 60 
individuals, corporations or governmental entities for the 61 
administration of the working group. 62 
(2) The working group shall not implement the provisions of this 63 
section if the funds solicited pursuant to subdivision (1) of this 64 
subsection are insufficient to pay the initial and ongoing expenses of the 65 
working group. 66 
(g) Not later than March 15, 2022, the working group shall submit a 67 
report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general 68 
statutes, on its progress in accomplishing the goals set forth in 69 
subsection (b) of this section to the joint standing committee of the 70 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce. 71 
Such report shall identify any barriers to accomplishing the goals set 72 
forth in subsection (b) of this section. 73 
(h) Not later than October 1, 2022, the working group shall submit a 74 
strategic plan, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the 75 
general statutes, to the joint standing committee of the General 76 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce that 77 
includes data, findings and legislative proposals to accomplish the goals 78 
set forth in subsection (b) of this section. The working group shall 79 
terminate on the date it submits such report or October 1, 2022, 80  Raised Bill No.  1021 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4355   	4 of 4 
 
whichever is later. 81 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To establish a manufacturing technology working group to ensure that 
manufacturers in the state have a clear road map for the lean application 
and integration of Industry 4.0 technology into their product 
development and production processes. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]