Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01021 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2021

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01021-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 1021  
January Session, 2021 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A MANUFACTURING TECH NOLOGY 
WORKING GROUP.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) As used in this section: (1) 1 
"Industry 4.0 technology", means the hardware, software and related 2 
innovations associated with the digitization of the manufacturing 3 
sector, allowing for the collection and analysis of all aspects of the 4 
manufacturing operations leading to increased quality, efficiency, 5 
productivity and security; and (2) "small and mid-sized manufacturers" 6 
means businesses engaged in manufacturing having fewer than one 7 
hundred fifty employees at any individual facility owned or operated 8 
by the business. 9 
(b) The chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General 10 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce shall 11 
appoint and convene a manufacturing technology working group to 12 
develop a strategic plan to ensure that manufacturers in the state have a 13 
strategy for the lean application and integration of Industry 4.0 14 
technology into their product development and production processes. 15 
(c) The working group shall: 16 
(1) Compile comprehensive profiles, including mission statements 17  Substitute Bill No. 1021 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01021-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 3 
 
and lists of services, for all entities that receive state or federal funding 18 
for the purpose of researching, developing, training, marketing, 19 
consulting or deploying Industry 4.0 technology or associated services 20 
directly to, or for the benefit of, manufacturing startups, small and mid-21 
sized manufacturers or other businesses primarily engaged in 22 
manufacturing; and 23 
(2) Conduct value-stream mapping and other analyses, as needed, to 24 
assess the flow of services from the entities identified in subdivision (1) 25 
of this subsection, to manufacturers in the state. Such analyses shall 26 
include, but need not be limited to, (A) identification of the extent to 27 
which such services complement, conflict with or duplicate each other, 28 
(B) assessment of the relative impacts of such services on the 29 
manufacturers served, (C) identification of gaps in services provided 30 
relative to the Industry 4.0 technology needs of manufacturers, (D) 31 
identification of barriers and recommendations for achieving the goals 32 
of the working group described in subsection (b) of this section, and (E) 33 
identification and assessment of participation levels in small business 34 
innovation research programs and small business technology transfer 35 
programs. 36 
(d) The chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General 37 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce shall 38 
appoint members to the working group. Appointments to the working 39 
group shall include, but need not be limited to, representatives from the 40 
joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 41 
matters relating to commerce, the Governor's chief manufacturing 42 
officer, representatives of entities described in subdivision (1) of 43 
subsection (c) of this section, a representative of the Connecticut Center 44 
for Advanced Technology, a representative of CONNSTEP, 45 
representatives of at least two manufacturers having fewer than 46 
seventy-five employees, representatives of at least two manufacturers 47 
having not less than seventy-five employees and not more than one 48 
hundred fifty employees, a representative of CTNext, a representative 49 
of the Connecticut Manufacturers' Collaborative, a representative of the 50  Substitute Bill No. 1021 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01021-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
Connecticut State Colleges and Universities, a representative of the 51 
Connecticut Conference of Independent Colleges, a representative of 52 
The University of Connecticut and a representative of Central 53 
Connecticut State University. The members of the working group 54 
representing small and mid-sized manufacturers shall comprise not less 55 
than thirty-three per cent of the working group and manufacturers shall 56 
comprise not less than fifty per cent of the working group. 57 
(e) The members appointed to represent the Connecticut Center for 58 
Advanced Technology and CONNSTEP shall co -chair the working 59 
group. The co-chairs shall schedule the first meeting of the working 60 
group not later than August 31, 2021. 61 
(f) Not later than March 15, 2022, the working group shall submit a 62 
report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general 63 
statutes, on its progress in accomplishing the goals set forth in 64 
subsection (b) of this section to the joint standing committee of the 65 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce. 66 
Such report shall identify any barriers to accomplishing the goals set 67 
forth in subsection (b) of this section. 68 
(g) Not later than October 1, 2022, the working group shall submit a 69 
strategic plan, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the 70 
general statutes, to the joint standing committee of the General 71 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce that 72 
includes data, findings and legislative proposals to accomplish the goals 73 
set forth in subsection (b) of this section. The working group shall 74 
terminate on the date it submits such report or October 1, 2022, 75 
whichever is later. 76 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
CE Joint Favorable Subst.   Substitute Bill No. 1021 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01021-
R01-SB.docx }   
4 of 4