Senate | 05/26/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | File Number 561 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 327 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |