Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 5, 2021
Fiscal Note June 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 8, 2021
Analysis June 5, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 28, 2021