Senate | 04/19/2021 | File Number 520 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 299 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |