Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01035 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01035-R01-
4-SB.docx
5-1 of 3
63
7-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 1035
4+LCO No. 4688 1 of 2
5+
6+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1035
87 January Session, 2021
8+LCO No. 4688
9+
10+
11+Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
12+
13+
14+Introduced by:
15+(ED)
916
1017
1118
1219
13-
14-AN ACT ESTABLISHING A TASK FORCE TO STUD Y ISSUES
15-RELATING TO THE IMPLEMENTATION OF AND CO STS ASSOCIATED
16-WITH EDTPA.
20+AN ACT CONCERNING TH E DEVELOPMENT OF A N EW
21+PRESERVICE PERFORMAN CE ASSESSMENT FOR TEACHER
22+PREPARATION PROGRAMS .
1723 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
1824 Assembly convened:
1925
20-Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) There is established a task force 1
21-to study issues relating to the implementation of the preservice 2
22-performance assessment, edTPA, as adopted by the State Board of 3
23-Education on December 7, 2016, as part of teacher preparation 4
24-programs, as defined in section 10-10a of the general statutes. The task 5
25-force shall examine (1) the positive and negative qualities of edTPA, (2) 6
26-how edTPA is being implemented in teacher preparation programs in 7
27-the state, (3) the financial costs associated with the implementation of 8
28-edTPA by institutions of higher education, including the short and long-9
29-term effects on students' student loan debt when such costs are included 10
30-in students' tuition or charged as a fee to students and such students use 11
31-student loans to pay for such tuition or fees, (4) the feasibility of 12
32-reducing or eliminating such costs and tuition or fees charged to 13
33-students enrolled in teacher preparation programs as part of the 14
34-implementation of edTPA, (5) whether other states are using edTPA as 15
35-part of teacher preparation programs or requiring completion of such 16
36-assessment for professional certification, and (6) the feasibility of 17
37-designing a new state-wide preservice performance assessment, that is 18 Substitute Bill No. 1035
26+Section 1. (Effective from passage) On and after July 1, 2023, the 1
27+Department of Education shall cease state-wide implementation of the 2
28+preservice performance assessment, edTPA, as adopted by the State 3
29+Board of Education on December 7, 2016. 4
30+Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) Not later than January 1, 2023, 5
31+the Commissioner of Education, the president of the Connecticut State 6
32+Colleges and Universities and the dean of the Neag School of Education 7
33+at The University of Connecticut shall jointly develop a preservice 8
34+performance assessment to be implemented in teacher preparation 9
35+programs, as defined in section 10-10a of the general statutes, offered at 10
36+public institutions of higher education in the state. Such preservice 11
37+performance assessment shall be developed with consideration given to 12
38+(1) the positive and negative qualities of previous preservice 13
39+performance assessments administered in the state, (2) how such 14 Raised Bill No. 1035
3840
3941
40-LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01035-
41-R01-SB.docx }
42-2 of 3
4342
44-evidence-based and incorporates best practices, to replace edTPA. 19
45-(b) The task force shall consist of the following members: 20
46-(1) Two appointed by the House chairperson of the joint standing 21
47-committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 22
48-relating to education, at least one of whom is a student who is currently 23
49-enrolled in a teacher preparation program in the state; 24
50-(2) Two appointed by the Senate chairperson of the joint standing 25
51-committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 26
52-relating to education, at least one of whom is a student who is currently 27
53-enrolled in a teacher preparation program in the state; 28
54-(3) One appointed by the House ranking member of the joint standing 29
55-committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 30
56-relating to education; 31
57-(4) One appointed by the Senate ranking member of the joint standing 32
58-committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 33
59-relating to education; and 34
60-(5) The Commissioner of Education, or the commissioner's designee. 35
61-(c) Any member of the task force appointed under subdivision (1), 36
62-(2), (3) or (4) of subsection (b) of this section may be a member of the 37
63-General Assembly. 38
64-(d) All initial appointments to the task force shall be made not later 39
65-than thirty days after the effective date of this section. Any vacancy shall 40
66-be filled by the appointing authority. 41
67-(e) The House and Senate chairpersons of the joint standing 42
68-committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 43
69-relating to education shall jointly select the chairperson of the task force 44
70-from among the members of the task force. The chairperson shall 45
71-schedule the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not later 46 Substitute Bill No. 1035
43+LCO No. 4688 2 of 2
7244
73-
74-LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01035-
75-R01-SB.docx }
76-3 of 3
77-
78-than sixty days after the effective date of this section. 47
79-(f) The administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the 48
80-General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education 49
81-shall serve as administrative staff of the task force. 50
82-(g) Not later than January 1, 2022, the task force shall submit a report 51
83-on its findings and recommendations to the joint standing committee of 52
84-the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to 53
85-education, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the 54
86-general statutes. The task force shall terminate on the date that it 55
87-submits such report or January 1, 2022, whichever is later. 56
45+preservice performance assessment will be implemented in teacher 15
46+preparation programs in the state, (3) the financial costs associated with 16
47+the implementation of such preservice performance assessment by 17
48+institutions of higher education, (4) reducing or eliminating any costs or 18
49+fees charged to students enrolled in teacher preparation programs as 19
50+part of the implementation of such preservice performance assessment, 20
51+and (5) designing such preservice performance assessment to be 21
52+evidence-based with incorporation of best practices. 22
53+(b) Not later than January 1, 2023, the Commissioner of Education 23
54+shall submit a report on the preservice performance assessment 24
55+developed under this section to the joint standing committee of the 25
56+General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education, 26
57+in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. 27
58+Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) On and after July 1, 2023, each 28
59+teacher preparation program, as defined in section 10-10a of the general 29
60+statutes, offered at an institution of higher education in the state, shall 30
61+administer the preservice performance assessment developed pursuant 31
62+to section 2 of this act. 32
8863 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
8964 sections:
9065
9166 Section 1 from passage New section
67+Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section
68+Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 New section
9269
93-ED Joint Favorable Subst.
70+Statement of Purpose:
71+To cease implementation of EdTPA and create a new state-wide
72+preservice performance assessment for teacher preparation programs.
73+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
74+that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
75+underlined.]
9476