Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 4, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 27, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021