Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Public Act 21-151
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
House Calendar Number 588
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7981
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
File Number 492
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 288
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|