Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01055 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 2, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 22, 2021
Analysis June 3, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021