Senate | 04/26/2021 | File Number 618 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 346 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/31 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |