Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01099 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO 6678 \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01099-R01-
4-SB.docx
5-1 of 4
3+
4+
5+
6+LCO No. 6678 1 of 4
67
78 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1099
89 January Session, 2021
910 LCO No. 6678
1011
1112
1213 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND
1314 BONDING
1415
1516
1617 Introduced by:
1718 (FIN)
19+
1820
1921
2022
2123 AN ACT AUTHORIZING B ONDS OF THE STATE FO R A RESEARCH
2224 FACULTY RECRUITMENT AND HIRING PROGRAM BY THE
2325 UNIVERSITY OF CONNEC TICUT TO ENCOURAGE T HE CREATION
2426 OF NEW BUSINESS VENT URES.
2527 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2628 Assembly convened:
2729
2830 Section 1. Section 10a-104c of the general statutes is repealed and the 1
2931 following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 2
3032 (a) The Board of Trustees of The University of Connecticut shall 3
3133 develop, continuously maintain and revise from time to time a program 4
3234 to facilitate the recruitment of eminent faculty and their research staffs 5
3335 to the university. Such program shall support economic development in 6
3436 the state through faculty research and promote core sectors of the state 7
3537 economy by accelerating the pace of applied research and development. 8
3638 Such program shall supplement the compensation of such faculty and 9
3739 related costs of personnel and materials needed to secure such faculty 10
3840 for the university. Eligibility shall be limited to individuals who have 11
39-demonstrated excellence in their field of research and have an interest 12 Raised Bill No. 1099
41+demonstrated excellence in their field of research and have an interest 12
42+in working collaboratively on research that meets societal needs or 13 Raised Bill No. 1099
4043
4144
42-LCO 6678 {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01099-
43-R01-SB.docx }
44-2 of 4
4545
46-in working collaboratively on research that meets societal needs or 13
46+LCO No. 6678 2 of 4
47+
4748 commercialization of discoveries, innovations or technologies. 14
4849 (b) Not later than April 1, 2020, and biennially thereafter, said board 15
4950 shall develop a plan for the recruitment and hiring of research faculty, 16
5051 including those whose research is focused on societal needs or can be 17
5152 commercialized. Such plan shall outline the operating and capital costs 18
5253 associated with the plan and include recruitment and hiring goals. 19
5354 (c) (1) The Board of Trustees of The University of Connecticut shall 20
54-commence a research faculty recruitment and hiring program in 21
55+commence a research facility recruitment and hiring program in 21
5556 accordance with the plan submitted pursuant to subsection (b) of this 22
5657 section. Such program shall be used (A) to hire faculty who meet the 23
5758 qualifications specified in subsection (a) of this section and who will 24
5859 assist the university in achieving the goals and requirements set forth in 25
5960 said subsection, and (B) to support the compensation of such faculty and 26
6061 related construction, renovation and equipment costs. 27
6162 (2) Under such program, the university shall encourage and facilitate 28
6263 the creation of new business ventures in the state that fuel economic 29
6364 growth and shall provide resources for proof of concept, technology 30
6465 maturation, early-stage and later-stage venture capital funding and 31
6566 other measures that encourage expansion of the university's 32
6667 entrepreneurial ecosystem. 33
6768 (d) The president of The University of Connecticut shall submit an 34
6869 annual report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, on the 35
6970 university's progress in meeting [such] hiring goals under this section 36
7071 and the implementation of the program under subsection (c) of this 37
7172 section to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having 38
7273 cognizance of matters relating to higher education and finance, revenue 39
7374 and bonding. 40
7475 Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) For the purposes described in 41
7576 subsection (b) of this section, the State Bond Commission shall have the 42
76-power from time to time to authorize the issuance of bonds of the state 43 Raised Bill No. 1099
77+power from time to time to authorize the issuance of bonds of the state 43
78+in one or more series and in principal amounts not exceeding in the 44
79+aggregate forty-six million one hundred thousand dollars, provided (1) 45 Raised Bill No. 1099
7780
7881
79-LCO 6678 {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01099-
80-R01-SB.docx }
81-3 of 4
8282
83-in one or more series and in principal amounts not exceeding in the 44
84-aggregate forty-six million one hundred thousand dollars, provided (1) 45
83+LCO No. 6678 3 of 4
84+
8585 six million four hundred sixty thousand dollars of such authorization 46
8686 shall be effective July 1, 2021, (2) eleven million seven hundred twenty-47
8787 nine thousand two hundred dollars of such authorization shall be 48
8888 effective July 1, 2022, (3) fourteen million four hundred eighty-nine 49
8989 thousand two hundred dollars of such authorization shall be effective 50
9090 July 1, 2023, (4) nine million two hundred twenty thousand dollars of 51
9191 such authorization shall be effective July 1, 2024, and (5) four million 52
9292 two hundred one thousand six hundred dollars shall be effective July 1, 53
9393 2025. 54
9494 (b) The proceeds of the sale of such bonds, to the extent of the amount 55
9595 stated in subsection (a) of this section, shall be used by the Board of 56
9696 Trustees of The University of Connecticut for the purposes of subsection 57
9797 (c) of section 10a-104c of the general statutes, as amended by this act. 58
9898 (c) All provisions of section 3-20 of the general statutes, or the exercise 59
9999 of any right or power granted thereby, that are not inconsistent with the 60
100100 provisions of this section are hereby adopted and shall apply to all 61
101101 bonds authorized by the State Bond Commission pursuant to this 62
102102 section. Temporary notes in anticipation of the money to be derived 63
103103 from the sale of any such bonds so authorized may be issued in 64
104104 accordance with section 3-20 of the general statutes and from time to 65
105105 time renewed. Such bonds shall mature at such time or times not 66
106106 exceeding twenty years from their respective dates as may be provided 67
107107 in or pursuant to the resolution or resolutions of the State Bond 68
108108 Commission authorizing such bonds. None of such bonds shall be 69
109109 authorized except upon a finding by the State Bond Commission that 70
110110 there has been filed with it a request for such authorization that is signed 71
111111 by or on behalf of the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management 72
112112 and states such terms and conditions as said commission, in its 73
113113 discretion, may require. Such bonds issued pursuant to this section shall 74
114114 be general obligations of the state and the full faith and credit of the state 75
115-of Connecticut are pledged for the payment of the principal of and 76 Raised Bill No. 1099
115+of Connecticut are pledged for the payment of the principal of and 76
116+interest on such bonds as the same become due, and accordingly and as 77
117+part of the contract of the state with the holders of such bonds, 78
118+appropriation of all amounts necessary for punctual payment of such 79 Raised Bill No. 1099
116119
117120
118-LCO 6678 {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01099-
119-R01-SB.docx }
120-4 of 4
121121
122-interest on such bonds as the same become due, and accordingly and as 77
123-part of the contract of the state with the holders of such bonds, 78
124-appropriation of all amounts necessary for punctual payment of such 79
122+LCO No. 6678 4 of 4
123+
125124 principal and interest is hereby made, and the State Treasurer shall pay 80
126125 such principal and interest as the same become due. 81
127126 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
128127 sections:
129128
130129 Section 1 July 1, 2021 10a-104c
131130 Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section
132131
133-FIN Joint Favorable
132+Statement of Purpose:
133+To provide funding for a research faculty recruitment and hiring
134+program by The University of Connecticut, with the goal of encouraging
135+and facilitating the creation of new business ventures.
136+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
137+that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
138+underlined.]
134139