Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01099 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/10/2021

                             
 
LCO 6678  \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01099-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1099  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 6678 
 
 
Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND 
BONDING  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(FIN)  
 
 
 
AN ACT AUTHORIZING B ONDS OF THE STATE FO R A RESEARCH 
FACULTY RECRUITMENT AND HIRING PROGRAM B Y THE 
UNIVERSITY OF CONNEC TICUT TO ENCOURAGE T HE CREATION 
OF NEW BUSINESS VENT URES.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 10a-104c of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 2 
(a) The Board of Trustees of The University of Connecticut shall 3 
develop, continuously maintain and revise from time to time a program 4 
to facilitate the recruitment of eminent faculty and their research staffs 5 
to the university. Such program shall support economic development in 6 
the state through faculty research and promote core sectors of the state 7 
economy by accelerating the pace of applied research and development. 8 
Such program shall supplement the compensation of such faculty and 9 
related costs of personnel and materials needed to secure such faculty 10 
for the university. Eligibility shall be limited to individuals who have 11 
demonstrated excellence in their field of research and have an interest 12  Raised Bill No. 1099 
 
 
LCO 6678  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01099-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
in working collaboratively on research that meets societal needs or 13 
commercialization of discoveries, innovations or technologies. 14 
(b) Not later than April 1, 2020, and biennially thereafter, said board 15 
shall develop a plan for the recruitment and hiring of research faculty, 16 
including those whose research is focused on societal needs or can be 17 
commercialized. Such plan shall outline the operating and capital costs 18 
associated with the plan and include recruitment and hiring goals.  19 
(c) (1) The Board of Trustees of The University of Connecticut shall 20 
commence a research faculty recruitment and hiring program in 21 
accordance with the plan submitted pursuant to subsection (b) of this 22 
section. Such program shall be used (A) to hire faculty who meet the 23 
qualifications specified in subsection (a) of this section and who will 24 
assist the university in achieving the goals and requirements set forth in 25 
said subsection, and (B) to support the compensation of such faculty and 26 
related construction, renovation and equipment costs.  27 
(2) Under such program, the university shall encourage and facilitate 28 
the creation of new business ventures in the state that fuel economic 29 
growth and shall provide resources for proof of concept, technology 30 
maturation, early-stage and later-stage venture capital funding and 31 
other measures that encourage expansion of the university's 32 
entrepreneurial ecosystem. 33 
(d) The president of The University of Connecticut shall submit an 34 
annual report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, on the 35 
university's progress in meeting [such] hiring goals under this section 36 
and the implementation of the program under subsection (c) of this 37 
section to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having 38 
cognizance of matters relating to higher education and finance, revenue 39 
and bonding.  40 
Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) For the purposes described in 41 
subsection (b) of this section, the State Bond Commission shall have the 42 
power from time to time to authorize the issuance of bonds of the state 43  Raised Bill No. 1099 
 
 
LCO 6678  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01099-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
in one or more series and in principal amounts not exceeding in the 44 
aggregate forty-six million one hundred thousand dollars, provided (1) 45 
six million four hundred sixty thousand dollars of such authorization 46 
shall be effective July 1, 2021, (2) eleven million seven hundred twenty-47 
nine thousand two hundred dollars of such authorization shall be 48 
effective July 1, 2022, (3) fourteen million four hundred eighty-nine 49 
thousand two hundred dollars of such authorization shall be effective 50 
July 1, 2023, (4) nine million two hundred twenty thousand dollars of 51 
such authorization shall be effective July 1, 2024, and (5) four million 52 
two hundred one thousand six hundred dollars shall be effective July 1, 53 
2025. 54 
(b) The proceeds of the sale of such bonds, to the extent of the amount 55 
stated in subsection (a) of this section, shall be used by the Board of 56 
Trustees of The University of Connecticut for the purposes of subsection 57 
(c) of section 10a-104c of the general statutes, as amended by this act. 58 
(c) All provisions of section 3-20 of the general statutes, or the exercise 59 
of any right or power granted thereby, that are not inconsistent with the 60 
provisions of this section are hereby adopted and shall apply to all 61 
bonds authorized by the State Bond Commission pursuant to this 62 
section. Temporary notes in anticipation of the money to be derived 63 
from the sale of any such bonds so authorized may be issued in 64 
accordance with section 3-20 of the general statutes and from time to 65 
time renewed. Such bonds shall mature at such time or times not 66 
exceeding twenty years from their respective dates as may be provided 67 
in or pursuant to the resolution or resolutions of the State Bond 68 
Commission authorizing such bonds. None of such bonds shall be 69 
authorized except upon a finding by the State Bond Commission that 70 
there has been filed with it a request for such authorization that is signed 71 
by or on behalf of the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management 72 
and states such terms and conditions as said commission, in its 73 
discretion, may require. Such bonds issued pursuant to this section shall 74 
be general obligations of the state and the full faith and credit of the state 75 
of Connecticut are pledged for the payment of the principal of and 76  Raised Bill No. 1099 
 
 
LCO 6678  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01099-
R01-SB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
interest on such bonds as the same become due, and accordingly and as 77 
part of the contract of the state with the holders of such bonds, 78 
appropriation of all amounts necessary for punctual payment of such 79 
principal and interest is hereby made, and the State Treasurer shall pay 80 
such principal and interest as the same become due. 81 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 10a-104c 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
FIN Joint Favorable