House | 04/26/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | House Calendar Number 270 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 67 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 01/06/2021 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |