House | 04/26/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | House Calendar Number 275 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 99 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |