Senate | 04/28/2021 | Senate Recommitted to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | File Number 1 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 15 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 01/26/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/01/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 01/20/2021 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/15/2021 | Public Hearing 01/20 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/06/2021 | Filed with Senate Clerks |