Senate | 03/23/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | File Number 43 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 68 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Filed with Senate Clerks |