Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 13, 2022
Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Fiscal Note March 30, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2022
Analysis March 30, 2022