Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Public Act 22-31
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 504
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
File Number 378
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
House Calendar Number 270
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|