Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 11, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 14, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022
Bill April 11, 2022
Analysis April 11, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 6, 2022