House
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Public Act 22-40
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6319
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 538
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5781
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
File Number 380
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
House Calendar Number 273
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|