House
|
05/24/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Public Act 22-97
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
File Number 679
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 521
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5584
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
File Number 48
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House Calendar Number 83
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|