Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05264 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note March 21, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 9, 2022
Analysis April 29, 2022
Analysis April 28, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 13, 2022