Senate | 04/27/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 503 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | File Number 457 | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | House Calendar Number 337 | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |