House
|
05/24/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Public Act 22-102
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
File Number 578
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 411
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4744
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
File Number 181
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House Calendar Number 154
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|