Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05305 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Fiscal Note March 29, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 20, 2022
Analysis April 21, 2022
Analysis April 20, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022
Analysis March 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 13, 2022