House | 04/26/2022 | File Number 633 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | House Calendar Number 476 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/25/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Public Hearing 03/21 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |