Senate | 04/27/2022 | File Number 673 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 498 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5529 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5480 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | File Number 391 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Calendar Number 279 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |