House | 04/11/2022 | File Number 392 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Calendar Number 280 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |