House
|
05/23/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Public Act 22-63
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 375
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
File Number 207
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House Calendar Number 189
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|