Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05373 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 30, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 22, 2022
Bill April 12, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022
Analysis March 30, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 10, 2022