Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Public Act 22-69
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 531
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5839
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
File Number 338
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
House Calendar Number 250
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|