Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05419 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 2, 2022
Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 6, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 19, 2022
Analysis April 30, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022
Analysis April 6, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 13, 2022