Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note April 14, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 29, 2022
Analysis April 28, 2022
Bill April 14, 2022
Analysis April 14, 2022