House | 04/30/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 535 | ||
House | 04/30/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5812 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | File Number 526 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | House Calendar Number 388 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 12:00 PM | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Public Hearing 03/21 | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |