Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05468 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Bill March 11, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 29, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022
Analysis April 19, 2022