Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Public Act 22-58
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 529
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6037
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
File Number 528
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Calendar Number 390
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/28
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|