House | 04/20/2022 | File Number 554 | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | House Calendar Number 404 | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Public Hearing 03/31 | ||
House | 03/25/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |