18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | AN ACT CONCERNING THE REMOVAL OF AN ENTERPRISE ZONE |
---|
22 | 22 | | DESIGNATION. |
---|
23 | 23 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
24 | 24 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | Section 1. Subsection (c) of section 32-70 of the general statutes is 1 |
---|
27 | 27 | | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from 2 |
---|
28 | 28 | | passage): 3 |
---|
29 | 29 | | (c) (1) On or before September 30, 1993, the Commissioner of 4 |
---|
30 | 30 | | Economic and Community Development shall approve the designation 5 |
---|
31 | 31 | | of ten areas as enterprise zones, not more than four of which shall be in 6 |
---|
32 | 32 | | municipalities with a population greater than eighty thousand and not 7 |
---|
33 | 33 | | more than six of which shall be in municipalities with a population of 8 |
---|
34 | 34 | | less than eighty thousand. 9 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) (A) On or after October 1, 1993, the commissioner shall approve 10 |
---|
36 | 36 | | the designation of two areas as enterprise zones. Each such area shall be 11 |
---|
37 | 37 | | in a municipality with a population of less than eighty thousand, in 12 |
---|
46 | 45 | | designation of an area of a municipality as an enterprise zone because 15 |
---|
47 | 46 | | of a plant closure in the municipality and there is a closure of another 16 |
---|
48 | 47 | | plant in any other municipality in the state by the same business, the 17 |
---|
49 | 48 | | commissioner shall also designate an area in such other municipality as 18 |
---|
50 | 49 | | an enterprise zone. If any such designated area includes a portion of a 19 |
---|
51 | 50 | | census tract in which any such base or plant is located, the census tracts 20 |
---|
52 | 51 | | in such area shall not be required to meet the eligibility criteria set forth 21 |
---|
53 | 52 | | under subsection (a) of this section for enterprise zone designation. If 22 |
---|
54 | 53 | | any such area is located elsewhere in the municipality, the census tracts 23 |
---|
55 | 54 | | in such area shall meet such eligibility criteria. As used in this 24 |
---|
56 | 55 | | subparagraph, (i) "base" means any United States or state of Connecticut 25 |
---|
57 | 56 | | military base or facility located in whole or in part within the state; (ii) 26 |
---|
58 | 57 | | "plant" means any manufacturing business or economic base business, 27 |
---|
59 | 58 | | as defined in section 32-222; and (iii) "closure" means any reduction or 28 |
---|
60 | 59 | | transfer in military personnel or civilian employment at one or more 29 |
---|
61 | 60 | | bases or plants in a municipality, which occurred between July 1, 1989, 30 |
---|
62 | 61 | | and July 1, 1993, or is scheduled to occur between July 1, 1993, and July 31 |
---|
63 | 62 | | 1, 1996, and exceeds two thousand persons. Such employment figures 32 |
---|
64 | 63 | | shall be certified by the Labor Department. 33 |
---|
65 | 64 | | (B) On or after October 1, 1993, the commissioner shall approve the 34 |
---|
66 | 65 | | designation of three other areas as enterprise zones, one of which shall 35 |
---|
67 | 66 | | be in a municipality with a population greater than eighty thousand and 36 |
---|
68 | 67 | | two of which shall be in municipalities with a population of less than 37 |
---|
69 | 68 | | eighty thousand. The census tracts in such areas shall meet the eligibility 38 |
---|
70 | 69 | | criteria set forth under subsection (a) of this section for enterprise zone 39 |
---|
71 | 70 | | designation. The commissioner shall approve the designation of 40 |
---|
72 | 71 | | enterprise zones under this subparagraph for those municipalities 41 |
---|
73 | 72 | | which he or she determines to have experienced the largest increases in 42 |
---|
74 | 73 | | poverty from October 1, 1989, to October 1, 1993, inclusive, based on a 43 |
---|
75 | 74 | | weighted average of the unemployment rate, caseload under the 44 |
---|
76 | 75 | | temporary family assistance program and per capita income of less than 45 |
---|
77 | 76 | | ninety per cent of the state average between 1985 and 1989. In making 46 |
---|
86 | 84 | | municipality's program for the implementation of an effective 49 |
---|
87 | 85 | | enterprise zone program. To the extent appropriate, the commissioner 50 |
---|
88 | 86 | | shall use the Regional Economic Models, Inc. (REMI) system in making 51 |
---|
89 | 87 | | the calculations for such determination. 52 |
---|
90 | 88 | | (C) Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a) of this section, 53 |
---|
91 | 89 | | municipalities that were not distressed municipalities under the 54 |
---|
92 | 90 | | provisions of subsection (b) of section 32-9p on February 1, 1986, shall 55 |
---|
93 | 91 | | be eligible to designate areas as enterprise zones under subparagraph 56 |
---|
94 | 92 | | (A) or (B) of this subdivision. 57 |
---|
95 | 93 | | (3) On or after July 1, 2014, the commissioner shall approve the 58 |
---|
96 | 94 | | designation of two areas as enterprise zones as follows: (A) One area 59 |
---|
97 | 95 | | shall be in a municipality with a population of not more than fifty 60 |
---|
98 | 96 | | thousand, as enumerated in the 2010 federal decennial census, and in 61 |
---|
99 | 97 | | which is located a United States Postal Service processing center that at 62 |
---|
100 | 98 | | any point in time employed one thousand or more persons, except that 63 |
---|
101 | 99 | | such area shall only be designated as an enterprise zone for a term of 64 |
---|
102 | 100 | | five years from the date any portion of the area is transferred, provided 65 |
---|
103 | 101 | | such transfer occurs on or after July 1, 2014, and (B) one area shall be in 66 |
---|
104 | 102 | | a municipality with a population of not less than seven thousand eight 67 |
---|
105 | 103 | | hundred and not more than seven thousand nine hundred, as 68 |
---|
106 | 104 | | enumerated in the 2010 federal decennial census, and having a total area 69 |
---|
107 | 105 | | of not more than 12.2 square miles. Each such enterprise zone area shall 70 |
---|
108 | 106 | | consist of two contiguous United States census tracts, contiguous 71 |
---|
109 | 107 | | portions of such census tracts or all or a portion of an individual census 72 |
---|
110 | 108 | | tract, as determined in accordance with the most recent federal 73 |
---|
111 | 109 | | decennial census and, if such area is covered by zoning, a portion of 74 |
---|
112 | 110 | | such area shall be zoned to allow commercial or industrial activity. The 75 |
---|
113 | 111 | | census tracts in each such enterprise zone area shall not be required to 76 |
---|
114 | 112 | | meet the eligibility criteria set forth in subsection (a) of this section. 77 |
---|
115 | 113 | | Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a) of this section, 78 |
---|
116 | 114 | | municipalities that were not distressed municipalities under the 79 |
---|
125 | 122 | | (4) (A) The commissioner shall not approve the designation of more 82 |
---|
126 | 123 | | than one enterprise zone in any municipality. The commissioner shall 83 |
---|
127 | 124 | | adopt regulations in accordance with chapter 54 concerning such 84 |
---|
128 | 125 | | additional qualifications for an area to become an enterprise zone as he 85 |
---|
129 | 126 | | or she deems necessary. 86 |
---|
130 | 127 | | (B) The commissioner may remove the designation of any area he or 87 |
---|
131 | 128 | | she has approved as an enterprise zone if such area no longer meets the 88 |
---|
132 | 129 | | criteria for designation as such an area set forth in this section or in 89 |
---|
133 | 130 | | regulations adopted pursuant to this section, [provided] except that no 90 |
---|
134 | 131 | | such designation shall be removed (i) less than ten years from the 91 |
---|
135 | 132 | | original date of approval of such zone, or (ii) if the number of residents 92 |
---|
136 | 133 | | in such area with income below the poverty level, as determined by the 93 |
---|
137 | 134 | | most recent United States census, has not been reduced by at least 94 |
---|
138 | 135 | | seventy-five per cent from the original date of approval of such zone. 95 |
---|
139 | 136 | | (C) The commissioner may designate any additional area as an 96 |
---|
140 | 137 | | enterprise zone if that area is designated as an enterprise zone, 97 |
---|
141 | 138 | | empowerment zone or enterprise community pursuant to any federal 98 |
---|
142 | 139 | | legislation. 99 |
---|
143 | 140 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
144 | 141 | | sections: |
---|
145 | 142 | | |
---|
146 | 143 | | Section 1 from passage 32-70(c) |
---|
147 | 144 | | |
---|